Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Notice to Municipal Corporations
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Angel, Carr, Chang, Fennell, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Sophocleus, A. Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company, before performing certain vegetation management within a municipal corporation, to provide notice of the proposed vegetation management to the municipal corporation where the vegetation management will be performed.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Notice to Municipal Corporations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM