Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Jameson, Mitchell, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program; requiring the State Department of Education to develop and implement the Program, in collaboration with specified entities; requiring specified circumstances to be met before the Program can be implemented; if the program can be implemented, requiring each board of education to choose one high school football team to participate in the Program and to provide specified team members with a concussion impact sensor; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-433, 7-433.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM