Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
21st Century Transportation Funding Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to calculate a certain sales and use tax equivalent rate under the motor fuel tax in a certain manner; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue on the sale of digital products to the Transportation Trust Fund; requiring the Department of Transportation to apply to the United States Department of Transportation to participate in the Surface Transportation System Funding Alternatives Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 21st Century Transportation Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - 21st Century Transportation Funding Act
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-217, 11-221, 2-1302.1, 9-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM