Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timeliness
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Boteler, Bromwell, Dwyer, Frank, McComas, McDonough, W. Miller, Myers, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Afzali
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that an absentee ballot returned by an absent uniformed services voter or an overseas voter be considered timely if the ballot is mailed by the voter and received by a local board by specified times.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125562/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {125562/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302, 9-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM