Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Jackson, and O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified personal property from the Calvert County property tax beginning on the date on which Dominion Resources, Inc., makes its first payment in lieu of taxes payment to Calvert County; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the Calvert County property tax; providing that specified personal property subject to a payment in lieu of taxes agreement shall be subject to the Calvert County property tax on the termination of the agreement; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0069 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM