Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing and revising provisions of law relating to trusts; providing that the Act may be cited as the Maryland Trust Act; providing for the scope of the Act; establishing whether a person has knowledge of a fact under the Act; establishing that a term of a trust prevails over specified other provisions of law, with specified exceptions; establishing that the common law of trusts and principles of equity supplement the Act, with a specified exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0753
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432618/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {432618/1 Report Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 14.5-101 through 14.5-1005, 14-101 through 14-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM