Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Lower-Cost Goods and Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Ready, Kipke, Krebs, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that when a primary procurement unit makes a specified determination concerning its participation in an intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement, the determination will include a statement that the agreement will allow an entity whose procurement is managed by the primary procurement unit to withdraw the entity's participation under the agreement under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0343
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0518 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM