Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, or operated by a licensed dentist; authorizing the Board to take certain action against certain applicants and licensees for accepting or tendering rebates or split fees; prohibiting a licensed dentist from raising as a defense that a duty or an obligation of the dentist was delegated or assigned to a third party; prohibiting a certain person who practices or attempts to practice dentistry without a license from aiding or abetting the unauthorized practice of dentistry; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019, July 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-103, 4-301, 4-315, 4-321, 4-601, 4-602, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM