Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly, Anderson, Arentz, Beitzel, Carozza, Fisher, Ghrist, Hayes, Hornberger, Lierman, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, McCray, McKay, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Patterson, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Saab, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified employers are not liable for negligently hiring or failing to adequately supervise an employee based on evidence that the employee has received probation before judgment for an offense or has been convicted of an offense under specified circumstances; providing that the Act does not limit or abrogate specified other immunities or defenses; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0055
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM