Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that an application for assisted outpatient treatment may be submitted to a court by specified individuals; authorizing, under specified circumstances, a court to order assisted outpatient treatment for a specified individual; requiring the Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response System to include a crisis communication center in each jurisdiction or region to provide mobile crisis teams operating in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1401, 10-1402, 10-1403, 10-929 through 10-937 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM