Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Aumann, Boteler, Bromwell, Dwyer, McComas, McDonough, W. Miller, Myers, Parrott, Serafini, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Maryland Department of the Environment to develop and use an alternate exhaust emissions test and an alternate emissions equipment and misfueling inspection under the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program for a motor vehicle that cannot take or pass the primary test or inspection for specified reasons; and authorizing the Administration and the Department to develop and use emissions tests or inspections previously used under the Program as an alternate test or inspection.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM