Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Dumais, Anderson, Hettleman, Korman, Lierman, Moon, Sydnor, and Haynes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to provide grants to eligible counties to establish or improve pretrial services programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; requiring certain distributions from the Fund to be used to supplement and not supplant certain other funds; establishing the requirements for a certain pretrial services program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1156
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary and Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {402517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-43)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Text - First - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary and Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {402517/1 Adopted 49
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-43) 50
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules 50
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text - Chapter - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-801 through 4-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM