Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Election Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing the daily compensation for each chief election judge from $225 to $450 per day and each election judge from $162.50 to $325 per day in Baltimore County.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Election Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Election Judges - Compensation
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM