Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurance producers who sell, solicit, or negotiate bail bonds to receive continuing education that directly relates to bail bond insurance.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0375
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
(   10-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page