Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Barron, Krimm, Proctor, and A. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a member of the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board may petition the circuit court to order certain entities to comply with an order from the Board; establishing that the failure to meet an established negotiation deadline is an unfair labor practice for certain entities under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0655
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1617 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {474961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-48)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {474961/1 Adopted 52A
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
Text - Third - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (85-48) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules 54
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {417474/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-2A-09, 3-306, 3-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM