Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a disciplinary panel to obtain a third peer review report from the entity or individual with whom the Board contracted or dismiss certain complaints against licensed physicians if only one of the two peer review reports makes a certain finding that a certain violation did not occur; prohibiting hospitals and related institutions, certain insurers, and certain carriers from taking adverse action under certain circumstances against physicians based solely on the fact that the physician was placed on probation; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1193 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-360.1 )
(   14-401.1, 14-404, 14-407.1 )
(   15-112, 19-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM