Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Dumais, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Folden, Gutierrez, Kaiser, McComas, Moon, Rosenberg, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking; specifying the purpose of the Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member of the Workgroup from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing the duties of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Asssembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0521
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {852218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328273/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {852218/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {328273/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM