Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Barron, Kaiser, and Smith
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified law enforcement agency or other State or local agency to conduct an inventory of specified sexual assault kit evidence on or before January 1, 2016; requiring a specified agency to prepare a report regarding untested sexual assault evidence collection kits on or before March 1, 2016; requiring the report to be submitted to the Attorney General; and requiring the Attorney General to prepare and submit to the General Assembly a specified report and specified recommendations on or before December 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM