Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Vogt, M. Washington, Simonaire, Ali, Wilkins, Rose, Patterson, Hornberger, Ebersole, Afzali, Hixson, Kaiser, Turner, C. Howard, A. Washington, Tarlau, and Mosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "foster care recipient" for specified tuition waivers to include an individual who resided in an out-of-home placement at the time the individual graduated from high school or successfully completed a GED; and clarifying that the definition of "tuition" includes fees for credit-bearing and noncredit courses.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {345062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {345062/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM