Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of State lottery to include a raffle conducted by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency; authorizing the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to enter into agreements to operate raffles with specified entities outside the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM