Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card - Failure to Issue
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster, Arentz, Folden, S. Howard, Malone, McConkey, and McKay
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, to be qualified for a specified retired officer identification card, a retired law enforcement officer be entitled to receive a pension or other retirement allowance; authorizing a retired law enforcement officer to file a civil action against a specified law enforcement agency for failure to issue a retired law enforcement officer identification card; authorizing the retired law enforcement officer to seek specified statutory damages in addition to specified relief; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM