Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Barve, Korman, Krimm, Moon, Platt, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish the Legislative Districting Commission to prepare a specified legislative districting plan and to establish the Congressional Districting Commission to prepare a specified congressional districting plan following each decennial census and after public hearings; prohibiting the plans from being amended; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page