Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Business and Economic Development)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the permissible uses of financial assistance from the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund in the Department of Business and Economic Development to include specified training projects and working capital for specified technology projects; and providing for the terms and conditions under which financial assistance for training and technology projects may be provided from the Fund.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-321, 5-322, 5-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM