Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees of the Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans to make arrangements for the safe custody of investments with one or more duly qualified custodian banks or trust companies; and exempting certain agreements with managers and custodians of assets in certain investment elections authorized under the statements of investment policy adopted by the Board from certain provisions of the procurement law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Text - Chapter - Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page