Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Kipke, Barron, Bromwell, Hammen, Hill, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, subject to specified requirements, dental hygienists to administer nitrous oxide to patients under the supervision of a dentist who is physically present on the premises and who has prescribed the administration of nitrous oxide; altering the definition of "practice dental hygiene"; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416486/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {416486/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61A
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-205, 4-206.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM