Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time during which establishments for which certain Class A and Class B-D-7 alcoholic beverages licenses are issued in the Park Heights Redevelopment Area in Baltimore City may sell alcoholic beverages.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Time
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2003, 12-2004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM