Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Anderson, Atterbeary, Conaway, Proctor, Queen, and Sanchez
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that exclude from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court a child of a specified age alleged to have committed specified offenses; repealing provisions of law governing the transfer of specified criminal cases to the juvenile court; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0215
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0304 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-215, 10-216, 4-202, 4-202.1, 4-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM