Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Truth in Sentencing Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons and Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Truth in Sentencing Task Force; providing for the membership and duties of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to appoint the chair of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation; authorizing a member of the Task Force to receive reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to report findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0681 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/30/2013 Text - First - Truth in Sentencing Task Force
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM