Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Carr, Cullison, A. Kelly, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Behavior Analyst Advisory Committee within the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists; requiring the Board to adopt regulations and a code of ethics; requiring the Board to set fees for services provided by the Board to behavior analysts; providing for the composition, appointment, and terms of the Committee members; establishing powers and duties of the Committee; requiring specified persons to be licensed by the Board before performing specified work in the State, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0611
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-4A-01 through 18-4A-32 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM