Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Gibson, Morales, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for wages paid by business entities to employees who participate in a diversion program providing rehabilitation and training services in lieu of criminal prosecution to an individual charged with a nonviolent criminal offense; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to approve applications on a first-come, first-served basis and notify the applicant within 45 days of receipt of the application; providing that the total tax credits may not exceed $100,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {155162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act)
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {155162/1 Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Employment of Diversion Program Participants (Second Chance Act)
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 39
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM