Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, an employer from discriminating in any manner or taking adverse action against an employee or an applicant using tobacco products off the employer's premises during nonworking hours; authorizing employees and applicants to submit to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry a written complaint under specified circumstances; authorizing the Commissioner to investigate whether a specified provision of the Act has been violated on receipt of a specified complaint; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM