Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - Appeals
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Adams, Anderson, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Cassilly, Folden, Hayes, Kittleman, Krebs, Lierman, Malone, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, W. Miller, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a supervisor of assessments or the supervisor's designee to hold a hearing on an appeal of a change in the value or classification of property that is transferred to a new owner by the later of 90 days after receiving the written appeal or 90 days after the deed evidencing the transfer is recorded.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {139334/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {139334/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-502, 8-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM