Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore County
Sponsored by
Delegates McDonough, Grammer, and Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore County; requiring that the Study Group examine the feasibility of building a racetrack and multipurpose center in Baltimore County with private funds to replace Pimlico Race Course, to conduct the Preakness Stakes and other horse races, and to serve as a venue for sporting and entertainment events; requiring the Study Group to report to certain Baltimore County officials and delegations of the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore County
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM