Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Chang, Cullison, Krimm, and Morales
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing the civil penalty for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights may not exceed $500.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0154
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-706, 21-706.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM