Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring merchants to provide to a consumer, at a specified time, a written receipt for a sale of consumer goods or services under specified circumstances; authorizing merchants to provide consumers with an electronic receipt in lieu of a written receipt for a sale of consumer goods or services under specified circumstances; and prohibiting merchants from charging consumers for a receipt for a sale of consumer goods or services.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0852
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM