Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hammen (Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act by extending to July 1, 2027, the termination provisions related to the specified authority of the Board; requiring the Board, by January 1, 2017, to adopt specified regulations regarding continuing education; requiring the Board to monitor the Long Term Environmental Health Workforce Work Group's activities for improving the recruitment and retention of environmental health specialists; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756684/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {756684/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {734738/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-205, 21-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM