Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Holmes, Attar, Boyce, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lehman, Otto, Stewart, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time frame of certain notices that a mobile home park owner is required to provide to each resident in the mobile home park and the Department of Housing and Community Development, and to post in a public area of the mobile home park, concerning the sale of the mobile home park, to be not less than 30 days before the date of the sale of the park.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {820211/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {820211/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8A-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM