Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Chang, Angel, Frush, A. Miller, Simonaire, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified licensees to complete a specified domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education as a condition of the first renewal for licenses issued by the State Board of Barbers and the State Board of Cosmetologists beginning June 1, 2018, with specified exceptions; specifying that a licensee who completes domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education to comply with a specified continuing education requirement may not be held civilly or criminally liable for specified actions or inactions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page