Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Owner or Operator of Livery Stable - Lien on Dairy Animal
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Dwyer, and Kipke
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Granting an owner or operator of a livery stable or other establishment who gives care or custody to a dairy animal a lien on the dairy animal for a specified charge incurred for the milking of the diary animal for the milk to be provided to a specified person.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Reassigned to Economic Matters 22
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM