Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Purchase of Motor Vehicles and Building Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, and Modification - Social Cost of Carbon Emissions
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Queen, Smith, Stein, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, on and after July 1, 2020, certain standards for purchase of vehicles by the Department of General Services include the social cost of certain carbon emissions as part of a life-cycle cost; requiring the Department of Budget and Management to adopt certain regulations on or before January 1, 2020; requiring the Department of General Services to calculate the social cost of carbon emissions during the preliminary design phase of the construction or renovation of any building; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Purchase of Motor Vehicles and Building Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, and Modification - Social Cost of Carbon Emissions
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-502, 4-803, 4-808.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM