Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Local Stormwater Management Charges - State Property
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Hucker, Niemann, and Reznik
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from a specified stormwater remediation fee for property specifically covered by a specified permit held by the State or a unit of State government unless being charged a fee is mutually agreed on by the State or unit of State government and the county or municipality charging the fee; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0529 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {100216/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {680412/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-10)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704336/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704336/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704336/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Special Order until evening session (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704336/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kasemeyer) {773422/2 Adopted (34-13)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {100216/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {680412/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-10) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {704336/1 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Conway) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {704336/1 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {704336/1 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Special Order until evening session (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments {704336/1 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Kasemeyer) {773422/2 Adopted (34-13) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13) 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM