Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a secured party to record an instrument of writing transferring residential property by the later of 30 days after the entry of a court order ratifying a foreclosure sale of the residential property or 30 days after the entry of a court order resolving a specified motion; providing that no transfer tax may be assessed on a secured party that records an instrument of writing transferring residential property within 20 days after the entry of the court order ratifying the foreclosure sale of the property; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM