Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish the Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot Program on or before January 1, 2017, to encourage young women and minorities to pursue environmentally friendly green careers; requiring funding for the Program through the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund to be $200,000 for fiscal year 2018, $500,000 for fiscal year 2019, and $1,500,000 for each of fiscal years 2020 and 2021; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page