Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Arentz, Barkley, Branch, Clippinger, Davis, Impallaria, Mautz, and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the technical staff of the Public Service Commission to assist a water company or a sewage disposal company in establishing a proposed just and reasonable rate; authorizing the technical staff to seek information from specified companies under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to restrict the availability of specified staff-assisted rate cases to companies who gross annual revenue for a specified time period are below an amount determined by the Commission, not to exceed $1,000,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Finance 26
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203, 4-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM