Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Hate-Bias Incident Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Ali, D. Barnes, Brooks, Fennell, Frush, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, C. Howard, Jackson, Kelly, McCray, A. Miller, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public institution of higher education to develop, implement, and submit to the Maryland Higher Education Commission a certain plan for a program to prevent hate-bias incidents; requiring each public institution of higher education to develop and implement a hate-bias response protocol; requiring an electronic crime alert notification system to include notification of hate-bias incidents; requiring public institutions of higher education to report certain information to the Commission each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Hate-Bias Incident Prevention
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM