Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Cassilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "soil conditioner" to include the digestate produced by anaerobic digestion for purposes of the Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Text - Chapter - Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM