Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage History Information
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Fennell, Angel, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, M. Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers that employ 15 or more employees from seeking wage history information orally, in writing, or through an employee or an agent for an employee; prohibiting employers that employ 15 or more employees from screening an applicant for employment based on the applicant's wage history by taking certain actions; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a certain order under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0377
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Pay Scales and Wage History Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563194/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Wage History Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Pay Scales and Wage History Information
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {563194/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Wage History Information
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-304.1, 3-304.2, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM