Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for Proposals
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to issue requests for proposals for Social Impact Bonds on or before January 1, 2014; authorizing the State Board to issue additional requests for proposals as needed; establishing minimum proposal guidelines; establishing minimum project selection guidelines; authorizing the State Board to contract with specified entities; requiring the State Board to submit annual reports to the Governor and the General Assembly beginning on or before September 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0434
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM