Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Deer Bow Hunting Season - End Date
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to include the first Saturday of February in the deer bow hunting season in any year that January 31 does not fall on a Saturday.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0412 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM