Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Ciliberti, Ivey, Solomon, Acevero, Attar, Bagnall, Barron, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boyce, Bridges, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Clark, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Stein, Terrasa, Valderrama, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum fine for a certain motor vehicle violation related to the right-of-way for pedestrians in crosswalks from $500 to $1,000.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {470816/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-17)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {470816/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM